This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/05/2022 at 21:19:21 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Amons, Rachel Ann Dominica

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Amons, Rachel Ann Dominica. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3165

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Amons, Rachel Ann Dominica

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Henson, Saul W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Time Estimate: 59 min; 60 day time waiver needed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 59 Minute time estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 001; PC451(c)-F- Arson Of Structure Or Forest; Not Guilty; 002; PC451(c)-664(a)-F- Attempted Arson Of Structure Or Forest; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Stark-Modlin, OPD 22-2193

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Defendant: Amons, Rachel Ann Dominica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Amons, Rachel Ann Dominica; 002; Description: PC451(c)-664(a)-F- Attempted Arson Of Structure Or Forest; Statute: 451(c)-664(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Amons, Rachel Ann Dominica; 001; Description: PC451(c)-F- Arson Of Structure Or Forest; Statute: 451(c); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant