This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/01/2022 at 20:05:18 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Agee, Devan Lewis

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Agee, Devan Lewis. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2360

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Agee, Devan Lewis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketWarrant Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketWarrant Abstract Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketWarrant Issued; Comment: Warrant Issued to BCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketRelease on Own Recognizance Revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketWarrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Warrant Ordered; Comment: Bring Logs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney A. Furry; BCSO 22-03109

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Agee, Devan Lewis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Agee, Devan Lewis; 001; Description: PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.