This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/31/2022 at 22:05:44 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Ackhavong, Louy

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Ackhavong, Louy. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2993

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ackhavong, Louy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Bench Warrant Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketWarrant Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Need Lao Interpreter to go over Statement of Right

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: Ackhavong, Louy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney A. Insul; BCSO 22-02711

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNotice - Sentence - Commitment Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ackhavong, Louy; 002; Description: HS11359(b)-M- Person Over 18 In Possession Of Marijuana For Sale; Statute: 11359(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ackhavong, Louy; 001; Description: HS11358(c)-M- Person Over 18 Planting/Cultivating More Than 6 Marijuana Plants; Statute: 11358(c); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.