Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 19:46:22 (UTC).

Yurtina VS Khaliqi

Case Summary

On 07/14/2005 Yurtina filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Khaliqi. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS J. NIXON and FREMONT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2715

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fremont Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

THOMAS J. NIXON

FREMONT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

YURTINA, LUBOV

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

KHALIQI, NAZIR

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

7/14/2005: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

7/19/2005: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Judgment Entered

8/17/2005: Judgment Entered

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Transferred

8/17/2005: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Transferred

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

8/17/2005: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Judgment Entered

8/17/2005: Judgment Entered

Notice of Change of Name and Address Filed

8/30/2005: Notice of Change of Name and Address Filed

Amended Judgment Filed

8/30/2005: Amended Judgment Filed

Request to Pay Judgment to Court Filed for Debtor

6/15/2012: Request to Pay Judgment to Court Filed for Debtor

Notice to Judgment Creditor Issued and Filed

6/15/2012: Notice to Judgment Creditor Issued and Filed

Returned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

6/27/2012: Returned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

7/16/2012: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Judgment Creditor Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Pay Judgment to Court Filed for Debtor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Name and Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Thomas J. Nixon; Department: Dept 603

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Fremont Judge Pro Tem; Department: Dept 601

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • DocketHearing Transferred to Small Claims Court Trial 08/17/2005 01:30 PM Dept: 603

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Transferred

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2005
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Valid As to Nazir Khaligi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 08/17/2005 01:30 PM D- 601

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less