Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/05/2021 at 00:41:28 (UTC).

Yu VS Cuadra

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 Yu filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cuadra. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES REILLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8382

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YU , JI HYE

Defendants

GLAMSHOCK LLC

CUADRA , JOSE

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Jose Cuadra Filed

9/9/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Jose Cuadra Filed

Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed

1/22/2021: Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed

Notice of Change of Address Filed

1/22/2021: Notice of Change of Address Filed

(*Email Notice of BlueJeans Notice sent via US Mail to DEF - Jose Cuadra) Filed

2/24/2021: (*Email Notice of BlueJeans Notice sent via US Mail to DEF - Jose Cuadra) Filed

(*Judge's Memo to Clerk - PTSC) Filed

3/3/2020: (*Judge's Memo to Clerk - PTSC) Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/20/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/20/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Court Mediation Referral Filed

2/25/2020: Notice of Court Mediation Referral Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

1/7/2020: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Case Management Statement of Ji Hye Yu Filed

1/17/2020: Case Management Statement of Ji Hye Yu Filed

Case Management Statement of Ji Hye Yu Filed

2/5/2020: Case Management Statement of Ji Hye Yu Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Jose Cuadra Filed

2/5/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Jose Cuadra Filed

Rejection Letter Issued on Summons Issued and Filed

12/3/2019: Rejection Letter Issued on Summons Issued and Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

12/5/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ji Hye Yu

10/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ji Hye Yu

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

10/8/2019: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 02/20/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

10/9/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 02/20/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

10/9/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 03/29/2021 09:30 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 03/12/2021 02:00 PM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 03/03/2021 09:00 AM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(*Email Notice of BlueJeans Notice sent via US Mail to DEF - Jose Cuadra) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Jose Cuadra Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party Jose Cuadra Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(*Judge's Memo to Clerk - PTSC) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 03/03/2021 09:00 AM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Jose Cuadra Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Ji Hye Yu Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Ji Hye Yu Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 02/20/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ji Hye Yu

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less