This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 02:10:06 (UTC).

Young VS Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Young filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NOL WISE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5096

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUNG, HENRY

Defendant

BERKELEY BOWL PRODUCE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LERNER, NEER

KANIEWSKI, JOHN A

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

4/13/2021: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Henry Young

4/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Henry Young

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

4/13/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/15/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 08/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

4/15/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 08/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

6/18/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc.

5/27/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc.

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/18/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/18/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Henry Young Filed

8/13/2021: Case Management Statement of Henry Young Filed

Case Management Statement of Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc. Filed

8/12/2021: Case Management Statement of Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc. Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Compliance Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Initial Case Management Conference 08/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 06/17/2022 09:01 AM D- 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference 07/22/2022 10:00 AM D- 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 08/01/2022 09:30 AM D- 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 08/18/2021 08:45 AM D- 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Henry Young Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc. Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Henry Young

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERKELEY BOWL PRODUCE, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lerner, Neer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANIEWSKI JOHN ANTHONY