Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/21/2020 at 02:34:00 (UTC).

Yonowitz VS Bayer Corp.,

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 Yonowitz filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against Bayer Corp . This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WINIFRED Y. SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8334

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STARK, REBEKAH

CURETON , NASHEED

REYNOLDS , MICHELLE

LEYBA, JENNIFER

MCKENZIE, AMI

SOULE, PATRICIA BARBANO

DUSSEAU, RITA

NEWMERGCKYI, JENNA

TYLER, DIONE

KUYKENDALL, AMANDA JEAN

APPLEBY, ANGELIC

WYGANT, HEATHER

KING, AMY

WOODRING , JULIE

BROOKS, NATALIA

LOPEZ , DENISSE

COOPER, TIFFANY

BUTTERFIELD, TANYA

HALL, CHRISTINA LEE

Defendant

BAYER ESSURE INC.

66 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCUDDER-LEVIN ESQ, JENNIE

 

Court Documents

Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

6/19/2019: Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion Granted

6/19/2019: Motion Granted

Case Management Conference 07/18/2019 09:01 AM D- 21

5/16/2019: Case Management Conference 07/18/2019 09:01 AM D- 21

Complaint - Mass Tort Filed

5/8/2019: Complaint - Mass Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alana Yonowitz

5/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alana Yonowitz

Minute Order Filed

5/8/2019: Minute Order Filed

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing/Electronic Service Filed

5/8/2019: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing/Electronic Service Filed

Register of Actions Filed

5/8/2019: Register of Actions Filed

Minute Order Filed

5/8/2019: Minute Order Filed

Minute Order Filed

5/8/2019: Minute Order Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

5/8/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Payment Receipt Filed

5/8/2019: Payment Receipt Filed

Notice of Case Assignment Filed

5/8/2019: Notice of Case Assignment Filed

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

5/8/2019: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Minute Order Filed

5/8/2019: Minute Order Filed

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 02/19/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 02/05/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 01/29/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 01/15/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 12/18/2019 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 11/13/2019 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 10/17/2019 09:01 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 09/19/2019 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 08/20/2019 09:01 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 08/29/2019 09:01 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing/Electronic Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRegister of Actions Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPayment Receipt Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketProvisionally Complex Civil Litigation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alana Yonowitz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Mass Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYER ESSURE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCUDDER-LEVIN ESQ, JENNIE