This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/05/2021 at 04:56:18 (UTC).

Yen VS Mosser

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 Yen filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Mosser. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRAD SELIGMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0261

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRAD SELIGMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BALL, JAMES

BLANCO, KAITLIN

TESSIER, MELINA

YEN, ANDREW

Defendants

1428 JACKSON STRRET ASSOCIATES, LP

553 SYCAMORE STREET ASSOCIATES, LP

CONSERVICE, LLC

FPI MANAGEMENT, INC.

MOSSER, NEVEO

OAK 1425 HARRISON STREET PROPERTY, LLC

OAK 1428 JACKSON, LLC

OAK 406 VAN BUREN AVE. PROPERTY, LLC

OAK-553 SYCAMORE, LLC

OAK9 PORTFOLIO OWNER, LP

PACH AFFORDABLE HOLDINGS, LLC

THE MOSSER COMPANIES, INC.

YARDI SYSTEMS, INC.

YES ENERGY MANAGEMENT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SALINAS, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Oak9 Portfolio Owner,

8/25/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Oak9 Portfolio Owner,

Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Yardi Systems, Inc. ,

8/24/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Yardi Systems, Inc. ,

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

8/11/2021: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

8/3/2021: Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion Dropped

8/3/2021: Motion Dropped

Case Management Statement of Oak9 Portfolio Owner, LP, Pach Affordable Holdings, LLC Filed

7/27/2021: Case Management Statement of Oak9 Portfolio Owner, LP, Pach Affordable Holdings, LLC Filed

Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

6/9/2021: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

Case Management Statement of Andrew Yen Filed

7/13/2021: Case Management Statement of Andrew Yen Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

7/21/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

First Amended Complaint Filed

6/28/2021: First Amended Complaint Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

6/28/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued

6/29/2021: Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued

Complaint Other Real Property - Motion Rescheduled

6/29/2021: Complaint Other Real Property - Motion Rescheduled

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

5/25/2021: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/25/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andrew Yen

5/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andrew Yen

Case Management Conference 07/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

6/1/2021: Case Management Conference 07/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Oak9 Portfolio Owner,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Yardi Systems, Inc. ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Other Real Property; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Oak9 Portfolio Owner, LP, Pach Affordable Holdings, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 07/27/2021 10:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Andrew Yen Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 07/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 06/29/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andrew Yen

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YES ENERGY MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Conservice, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Yardi Systems Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE MOSSER CO. INC. is a litigant