This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 02:36:24 (UTC).

Xu VS Office of the President ATTN: Legal Department

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 Xu filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Office of the President ATTN Legal Department. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7619

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WANG, MICHAEL

XU, XUAN

Defendant

OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT ATTN: LEGAL DEPARTMENT

 

Court Documents

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/27/2021 09:00 AM D- 519

7/26/2021: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/27/2021 09:00 AM D- 519

Letter re Certified Mailing Service Received

5/17/2021: Letter re Certified Mailing Service Received

Release of Funds Issued and Filed

5/20/2021: Release of Funds Issued and Filed

Rejection Letter Issued on Miscellaneous

6/3/2021: Rejection Letter Issued on Miscellaneous

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

4/19/2021: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 519; Action: Claim of Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/27/2021 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Miscellaneous

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease of Funds Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter re Certified Mailing Service Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 07/26/2021 01:30 PM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRESIDENT is a litigant