This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 12/15/2022 at 22:09:56 (UTC).

Woodbridge Construction, Inc. VS Salloway

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 Woodbridge Construction, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Salloway. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Nol Wise. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6932

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Nol Wise

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

WOODBRIDGE CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Dora M. Salloway

Richard J. Alexander

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/26/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/6/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 04/21/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

2/1/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 04/21/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Declaration of Service by Mail

07/26/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed Request for Dismissal w/o Prejudice - Entire Action

06/23/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed Request for Dismissal w/o Prejudice - Entire Action

Case Management Conference Order Issued

07/26/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Woodbridge Construction, Inc. Filed

04/19/2021: Case Management Statement of Woodbridge Construction, Inc. Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

04/06/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

02/01/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 04/21/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

02/01/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 04/21/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

12/03/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Woodbridge Construction, Inc.

12/03/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Woodbridge Construction, Inc.

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

12/03/2020: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conf Continuance Hearing Dropped from dept: 24 date: 10/07/2021 time: 01:30 PM; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conf Continuance 10/07/2021 01:30 PM D- 24; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMessage: Hearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 10/18/2021 09:00 AM D- 24; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Service by Mail; Category: DSM002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMessage: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 10/18/2021 09:00 AM D- 24; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference Order Issued; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement of Woodbridge Construction, Inc. Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMessage: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 24; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference Order Issued; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 04/21/2021 09:00 AM D- 24; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Woodbridge Construction, Inc.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less