This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/23/2020 at 04:05:03 (UTC).

Woldu VS Holland

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 Woldu filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Holland. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JENNA WHITMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7954

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JENNA WHITMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

SIBHAT, EYASU

WOLDU, BELAY ABERA

Defendants and Debtor / Appellees

HOLLAND, ERIN

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Facts Issued

12/18/2019: Certificate of Facts Issued

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

10/18/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Judgment Entered

10/23/2019: Judgment Entered

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

10/18/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

10/18/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

9/30/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

9/30/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

8/16/2019: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

7/29/2019: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

7/22/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Facts Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Contested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Jenna Whitman; Department: Dept 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Jenna Whitman; Department: Dept 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 507 date: 10/18/2019 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 09/30/2019 09:00 AM D- 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 09/30/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less