Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/22/2021 at 02:53:19 (UTC).

Winikoff VS Community Rebuild Partners LLC,

Case Summary

On 11/03/2017 Winikoff filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Community Rebuild Partners LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRAD SELIGMAN, WINIFRED Y. SMITH, ROBERT MCGUINESS and PATRICK J. ZIKA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1286

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

BRAD SELIGMAN

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

ROBERT MCGUINESS

PATRICK J. ZIKA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

WINIKOFF, BRANDEE

WINIKOFF, SHAWN

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KENNEDY, MARK

CORBERTT, JOHN

JEPSON, LEWIS

GILWIN COMPANY

FERREIRA, ERON

CONCRETE SOLUTIONS, INC.,

CORBERTT/SALVADOR CONSTRUCTION INC.

CHANDLER/HAM, INC.

WARD, JEREMY L.

MEYER, ERIC

COMMUNITY REBUILD ASSET HOLDINGS, INC.

HEBNER, GREGORY

MARELL INSPECTION SERVICES, INC.

COMMUNITY REBUILD PARTNERS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;

EMPIRE REALTY ASSOCIATES, INC.

WINIKOFF, BRANDEE

WINIKOFF, SHAWN

1 THROUGH 50, ROES

COMMUNITY REBUILD PARTNERS, LLC

COMMUNITY REBUILD ASSET HOLDINGS, LLC

65 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PETERSON, P. KURT

HAM, CAROLINE

JONES, SHANNON B.

CORYELL, BRYAN D.

BETTER, JORDANA N.

TOWNSEND, KASEY C

WILSON, DEBORAH J.

THOMAS, JENNIFER R

HILL, ANDRE R

LUGAY, ARVIN C.

O'BRIEN, PATRICK

KRAFT, PHILIP A.

CASTILLO, MONICA

JR., JOHN VAN DE POEL

LIBERTINO, TERESA A.

SARRAIL, JAMES A.

MCINERNEY, TIMOTHY L.

SCHELEY III, L THEODORE

PAIGE, ROBERT N

MARTIN, SONIA RENEE

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 02/13/2018 09:00 AM D- 21

2/5/2018: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 02/13/2018 09:00 AM D- 21

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/13/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/13/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/13/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/13/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/6/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/6/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/20/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/20/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Gilwin Company Filed

11/5/2020: Case Management Statement of Gilwin Company Filed

Case Management Statement of Concrete Solutions, Inc.,, Eron Ferreira Filed

9/29/2020: Case Management Statement of Concrete Solutions, Inc.,, Eron Ferreira Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party SC Shower Pans, Inc. Filed

6/29/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party SC Shower Pans, Inc. Filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

2/6/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

8/13/2018: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gilwin Company Filed

12/7/2017: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gilwin Company Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Jeremy L. Ward

1/18/2018: Answer to Complaint Filed for Jeremy L. Ward

Case Management Statement of Concrete Solutions, Inc.,, Eron Ferreira Filed

1/31/2018: Case Management Statement of Concrete Solutions, Inc.,, Eron Ferreira Filed

Opposition To Demurrer To Cross-Complaint Filed

7/9/2018: Opposition To Demurrer To Cross-Complaint Filed

376 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Complaint - Construction Defect

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Motion to Sever

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Motion to Confirm Good Faith Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMotion to Sever Hearing Confirmed for 05/21/2021 10:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMotion to Sever Filed by Brandee Winikoff, Shawn Winikoff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Settlement Conference; Judge: Robert McGuiness; Department: Dept 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Good Faith Settlement Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
481 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Mark Kennedy Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 01/30/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Filed by Chandler/Ham, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Demurrer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 02/13/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 01/02/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Construction Defect Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Brandee Winikoff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMPIRE REALTY ASSOCIATES, INC. is a litigant