Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 19:10:46 (UTC).

Wilson VS Wilson

Case Summary

On 02/27/2004 Wilson filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Wilson. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JACOB BLEA III, ALICE VILARDI and CHERIE T. DAVIS, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3372

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JACOB BLEA III

ALICE VILARDI

CHERIE T. DAVIS, PORE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILSON, TAMI

Respondent

WILSON, TIMOTHY

Others

PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC SAVINGS PLAN

PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC RETIREMENT PLAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CAMPANILE, CYNTHIA

FINNEGAN, LESLIE E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketWithdrawal of Attorney Filed for Tami Wilson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketOrder/Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketDeclaration in Support Request to Terminate Order/Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Timothy Wilson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • DocketQualified Domestic Relations Order for Support Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketWithdrawal of Attorney Filed for Tami Wilson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2004
  • DocketResponsive Declaration re: Order to Show Cause Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2004
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2004
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration Filed for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2004
  • DocketResponsive Declaration re: Notice of Motion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2004
  • DocketResponse to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed for Timothy Wilson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2004
  • DocketProof of Service on Petition for Dissolution of Marriage As to Timothy Wilson Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2004
  • DocketOSC - Family Law 04/23/2004 09:00 AM D- 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2004
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Child Custody,.. Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2004
  • DocketSummons on Petition Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2004
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacific Gas and Electric Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Campanile, Cynthia