This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 04:02:35 (UTC).

Wilson VS Jones Smith

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Wilson filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Jones Smith. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PELAYO A. LLAMAS and JOSCELYN JONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0940

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

PELAYO A. LLAMAS

JOSCELYN JONES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILSON , FRANCES

Respondent

JONES SMITH , ALENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CONNER, ALANA GRICE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment; Judge: Joscelyn Jones; Department: Dept 105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketPetition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Harassment Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Frances Wilson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on DENIED-TRO Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment; Judge: Joscelyn Jones; Department: Dept 105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Harassment 05/07/2021 09:00 AM D- 105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Harassment Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment; Judge: Joscelyn Jones; Department: Dept 105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing on a Denied TRO Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketFiled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Harassment 10/06/2020 08:30 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Harassment Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketAmended Notice of Hearing on DENIED TRO Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketAmended Order on DENIED TRO Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Harassment 09/17/2020 08:30 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Notice Upon Exparte Application for Orders Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment Prevention) Received for Frances Wilson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPetition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less