Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/22/2020 at 02:42:56 (UTC).

Wilson VS Chaya Centers, Inc

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 Wilson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Chaya Centers, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JENNA WHITMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8140

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JENNA WHITMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILSON , FUMIYA

WILSON , CHARLES J

Defendants

CHAYA CENTERS, INC

JOSEPH , LINDA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PECK, STEVEN C.

JACOBSON, REUBEN B.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

12/24/2019: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

12/12/2019: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/27/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

12/16/2019: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/27/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

10/8/2019: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/8/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

9/6/2019: Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/21/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/2/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

3/22/2019: Tentative Case Management Order

Answer to Complaint Filed for Chaya Centers, Inc , Linda M Joseph

3/22/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Chaya Centers, Inc , Linda M Joseph

Case Management Statement of Charles J Wilson Filed

3/11/2019: Case Management Statement of Charles J Wilson Filed

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 04/02/2019 01:30 PM D- 507

2/23/2019: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 04/02/2019 01:30 PM D- 507

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 03/26/2019 01:30 PM D- 507

2/19/2019: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 03/26/2019 01:30 PM D- 507

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

2/11/2019: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Notice of Case Management Conference Filed

12/12/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 03/25/2019 02:30 PM D- 110

11/13/2018: Initial Case Management Conference 03/25/2019 02:30 PM D- 110

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11/13/2018: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Charles J Wilson

11/9/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Charles J Wilson

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/27/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 303 date: 06/15/2020 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketPretrial Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 507 date: 06/26/2020 time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Status re: ADR; Judge: Jenna Whitman; Department: Dept 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jenna Whitman; Department: Dept 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment of Judge for All Purposes Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 03/26/2019 01:30 PM D- 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Chaya Centers, Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/25/2019 02:30 PM D- 110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Charles J Wilson

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBSON, REUBEN B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PECK STEVEN C. ESQ.