This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/15/2020 at 20:23:46 (UTC).

Williams VS Shepard

Case Summary

On 02/13/1998 Williams filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Shepard. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Wiley W Manuel Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TALLY CRAIG -. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4881

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/1998

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

TALLY CRAIG -

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

WILLIAMS, RICHARD

Defendants and Debtor / Appellees

SHEPARD, SHIRLEY

ESPEN, BETTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCHULTZ, TODD L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

2/13/1998: Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

Summons with Proof of Service As to Betty Espen Filed

2/24/1998: Summons with Proof of Service As to Betty Espen Filed

Request for Entry of Default Filed for Shirley Shepard , Betty Espen

2/24/1998: Request for Entry of Default Filed for Shirley Shepard , Betty Espen

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Shirley Shepard Filed

3/4/1998: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Shirley Shepard Filed

Request for Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) Filed for Shirley Shepard

3/4/1998: Request for Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) Filed for Shirley Shepard

Judgment Default: Clerk CCP 1169 Entered

3/4/1998: Judgment Default: Clerk CCP 1169 Entered

Request for Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered

3/25/1998: Request for Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered

Declaration for Judgment by Court (CCP 585 (d) ) Filed

3/25/1998: Declaration for Judgment by Court (CCP 585 (d) ) Filed

Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed

4/3/1998: Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed

Rejection Letter Filed

6/26/1998: Rejection Letter Filed

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

8/17/1998: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

Request Re: Declaration Filed

8/25/1998: Request Re: Declaration Filed

Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

10/6/1998: Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

Request Re: Proposed Judgment Filed

10/21/1998: Request Re: Proposed Judgment Filed

Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

11/4/1998: Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

Civil OSC - Complaints 12/21/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

11/6/1998: Civil OSC - Complaints 12/21/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

12/21/1998: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action

1/29/1999: Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/1999
  • DocketDismissal /1169 - partial as to money damages Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal /1169 - partial as to money damages Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/1999
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Hearing Dropped from dept: 14 date: 02/08/1999 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/1998
  • DocketMinutes: Status re: Dismissal - UD Money Pending; Judge: Tally Craig - Pro Tem; Department: Dept 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/1998
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil OSC - Complaints dept: 14 date: 02/08/1999 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints 12/21/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Proposed Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default: Clerk CCP 1169 Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/1998
  • DocketRequest for Judgment Default : Clerk CCP 1169/Money Pending Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/1998
  • DocketJudgment Default : Clerk CCP 1169

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) Filed for Shirley Shepard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Shirley Shepard Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/1998
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default As to Shirley Shepard , Betty Espen Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Filed for Shirley Shepard , Betty Espen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons with Proof of Service As to Betty Espen Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/1998
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less