This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/20/2020 at 04:32:53 (UTC).

Williams VS Landolf

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Williams filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Landolf. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2207

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAMS , R. MICHAEL DR

WILLIAMS, ELLEN

Defendant

LANDOLF , MARK E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TOM, QUINLAN S.

GARY, TODD B.

SABHARWAL, SUNENA

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney Filed for R. Michael Williams DR, Ellen Williams

5/1/2020: Substitution of Attorney Filed for R. Michael Williams DR, Ellen Williams

Case Management Statement of Mark E Landolf Filed

5/4/2020: Case Management Statement of Mark E Landolf Filed

Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty As to R. Michael Williams DR, El

5/4/2020: Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty As to R. Michael Williams DR, El

Case Management Statement of Mark E Landolf Filed

5/5/2020: Case Management Statement of Mark E Landolf Filed

Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty As to R. Michael Williams DR, El

5/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty As to R. Michael Williams DR, El

Tentative Case Management Order

5/13/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Statement of R. Michael Williams DR, Ellen Williams Filed

5/14/2020: Case Management Statement of R. Michael Williams DR, Ellen Williams Filed

Returned Mail: Case Management Order Filed

1/27/2020: Returned Mail: Case Management Order Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Mark E Landolf

12/27/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Mark E Landolf

Case Management Statement of Mark E Landolf Filed

12/27/2019: Case Management Statement of Mark E Landolf Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

12/27/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/6/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/6/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mark E Landolf Filed

8/30/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mark E Landolf Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 01/06/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

8/23/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 01/06/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

8/22/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for R Michael Williams DR

8/22/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for R Michael Williams DR

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

8/22/2019: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of R. Michael Williams DR, Ellen Williams Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty As to R. Michael Williams DR, El

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Mark E Landolf Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty As to R. Michael Williams DR, El

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Mark E Landolf Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for R. Michael Williams DR, Ellen Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Case Management Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 05/18/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Mark E Landolf Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Mark E Landolf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Mark E Landolf Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketCourt File Transfer to Hayward Hall of Justice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/06/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for R Michael Williams DR

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd B Gary

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOM, QUINLAN S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SABHARWAL, SUNENA