Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 08:13:20 (UTC).

Wheeler VS Downs

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 Wheeler filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Downs. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES REILLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8437

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Debtor / Appellees

WHEELER, SCOTT

NOONAN, NAN

Defendants and Others

DOWNS, DAVID

WHOLELIFE HOMES

VALLEY , DANIELLE

1619 WALNUT ST., LLC

WHITE, B. MICHAEL

WINDHAM , JEFFREY

GOSHAL, DAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

VERBECK, ALEX

JEWELL, COLIN H.

PATERSON, NAIRI

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/29/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/2/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/17/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/22/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/22/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

1/14/2021: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/22/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/13/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/17/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/17/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of David Downs, Jeffrey Windham Filed

3/15/2021: Case Management Statement of David Downs, Jeffrey Windham Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

12/2/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Proof of Service on Motion

10/9/2020: Proof of Service on Motion

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/3/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Declaration in Support of Informal Discovery Conference Request Filed

3/16/2020: Declaration in Support of Informal Discovery Conference Request Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/20/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

1/7/2020: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Wholelife Homes Filed

11/14/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Wholelife Homes Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 02/20/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

10/9/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 02/20/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Court Ordered : Delay in Prosecution (CCP 583) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Partial As to Scott Wheeler, Nan Noonan, David Downs, Wholelife Homes, Dan Goshal, B. Micha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Order to Show Cause; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Judgment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of David Downs, Jeffrey Windham Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of David Downs, Danielle Valley, Jeffrey Windham Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 03/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Wholelife Homes Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to David Downs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Due Diligence Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 02/20/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Scott Wheeler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VERBECK, ALEX

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATERSON, NAIRI

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEWELL, COLIN H