This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 09:01:53 (UTC).

Western Surety Company VS Blue Star Construction

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 Western Surety Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Blue Star Construction. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4692

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

Defendants

BLUE STAR CONSTRUCTION

PINEDA, NENITA

TIAN, MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PAGAN, JOHN M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

7/14/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 11/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

7/14/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 11/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7/2/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Western Surety Company

7/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Western Surety Company

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

7/2/2021: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Nenita Pineda Filed

9/3/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Nenita Pineda Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Blue Star Construction Filed

9/3/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Blue Star Construction Filed

Case Management Statement of Mary Tian Filed

9/3/2021: Case Management Statement of Mary Tian Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Mary Tian

9/10/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Mary Tian

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Mary Tian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Nenita Pineda Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Blue Star Construction Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Mary Tian Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Western Surety Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAGAN JOHN