This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/04/2020 at 19:36:55 (UTC).

Western Management Properties, Inc. VS Luckett-Haydon

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Western Management Properties, Inc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Luckett-Haydon. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2812

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN MANAGEMENT PROPERTIES, INC.

Defendants

LUCKETT-HAYDON , CHANDRA R.

LUCKETT-HAYDON, CHANDRA R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HORWITZ, ALAN

 

Court Documents

Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

2/13/2020: Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

2/14/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

Release of Funds Issued and Filed

2/20/2020: Release of Funds Issued and Filed

Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for Chandra R. Luckett-Haydon

2/7/2020: Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for Chandra R. Luckett-Haydon

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Western management Properties, Inc.

1/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Western management Properties, Inc.

Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

1/31/2020: Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

1/31/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Access to UD Case Issued

2/4/2020: Notice of Access to UD Case Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Chandra R. Luckett-Haydon

2/5/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Chandra R. Luckett-Haydon

Order to Transfer/Reclassify Case Jurisdiction Filed

2/5/2020: Order to Transfer/Reclassify Case Jurisdiction Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease of Funds Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Answer to Complaint Filed for Chandra R. Luckett-Haydon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCase Jurisdiction Reclassified to Limited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Transfer/Reclassify Case Jurisdiction Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Chandra R. Luckett-Haydon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Chandra R. Luckett-Haydon Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Chandra R. Luckett-Haydon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Access to UD Case Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Western management Properties, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less