This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/30/2021 at 19:55:57 (UTC).

West VS A & A Key and Builders Supply

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 West filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A A Key and Builders Supply. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JO-LYNNE Q. LEE, MICHAEL M. MARKMAN, PATRICK J. ZIKA and JEFFREY BRAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1848

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

MICHAEL M. MARKMAN

PATRICK J. ZIKA

JEFFREY BRAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Debtor / Appellees

WEST, DONALD G.

WEST, BERTHA NADINE

Defendants and Others

CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD

DB FITE PROPERTIES, INC.

DB WILLIAMSON, INCORPORATED

A & A KEY AND BUILDERS SUPPLY

B & B & SONS ENTERPRISES

A.H. VOSS COMPANY

BUZZ OATES & ASSOCIATES

BASFORD INVESTMENT CORPORATION

BWDAC, INC.

B.T. MANCINI CO., INC.

BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC.

C & 0 DEVELOPMENT, INC.

A.R. HENSLEY, INC.

AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

MARK L. URES HOME CONSTRUCTION, INC.

STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.

DON WILLIAMSON, INCORPORATED

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AMELL, DAVID L.

WOOD, J. SCOTT

OBERG, LISA L.

SHARP, GARY D.

HUGO, EDWARD R.

DUFFY, JOSEPH

JACOBSEN, KAREN L

HANSEN, HALEY L.

KARREN, BRENT M.

ENGEL, ROBERT G.

POND, FRANK D.

BURCH, DANA L.

BRYDON, JOHN R.

RASMUSSEN, JENNIFER C.

FRAENKEL ESQ, CONSTANCE

CAMPAGNE, INGRID T.

ROSENDIN, JOANNE

CURLIANO, JASON J

MCKLEROY, B. GARDINER

WAH, DOUGLAS G.

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/20/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/20/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

11/14/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/2/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/2/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/4/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/4/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/4/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Tentative Case Management Order

8/30/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Motion in Limine No. 10 Filed

1/22/2021: Motion in Limine No. 10 Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

12/7/2020: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Opposition to Motion in Limine #2 Filed

12/3/2020: Opposition to Motion in Limine #2 Filed

Motion for Summary Judgment Denied

12/4/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment Denied

Declaration in Support Amended AmyM Kott Filed

10/27/2020: Declaration in Support Amended AmyM Kott Filed

Case Management Statement of Donald G. West, Bertha Nadine West Filed

9/25/2020: Case Management Statement of Donald G. West, Bertha Nadine West Filed

Order INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

6/15/2020: Order INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

STIPULATION AND ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE Filed

7/13/2020: STIPULATION AND ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE Filed

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

5/21/2020: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

844 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Pneumo Abex LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Asbestos; Judge: Jeffrey Brand; Department: Dept 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Partial As to Donald G. West, Bertha Nadine West Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc. Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Borgwarner Morse Tec, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
1,091 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for B.T. Mancini Co., Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 08/07/2020 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Donald G. West

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DB FITE PROPERTIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where B.T. Mancini Company is a litigant