This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/04/2020 at 00:13:30 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. VS Smith

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 Wells Fargo Bank, N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1563

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendants

SMITH, EQUAAN D.

ROBINSON, RUSSELL A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LEE, JAMES T.

 

Court Documents

Opposition to Defendant Robinson's Demurrer and Defendant Smith's Joinder to Demurrer Filed

4/16/2020: Opposition to Defendant Robinson's Demurrer and Defendant Smith's Joinder to Demurrer Filed

Hearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 07/02/2020 01:30 PM D- 22

4/7/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 07/02/2020 01:30 PM D- 22

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/4/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed

3/6/2020: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed

3/6/2020: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed

Declaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer Filed by Russell A. Robinson

2/27/2020: Declaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer Filed by Russell A. Robinson

Motion for Joinder Filed for Defendant

2/27/2020: Motion for Joinder Filed for Defendant

Consent to Eletronic service and Filed

2/26/2020: Consent to Eletronic service and Filed

Notice of of assignment of Judge for all Purposes Filed

2/18/2020: Notice of of assignment of Judge for all Purposes Filed

Notice of of Case Management Conference and order Filed

2/18/2020: Notice of of Case Management Conference and order Filed

Notice of Pendency of Action Filed

2/18/2020: Notice of Pendency of Action Filed

Acknowledgement of Receipt of Transferred Case. New Case #

2/10/2020: Acknowledgement of Receipt of Transferred Case. New Case #

Acknowledgement of Receipt of Transferred Case. New Case #

2/10/2020: Acknowledgement of Receipt of Transferred Case. New Case #

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

1/23/2020: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

1/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

1/23/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 06/08/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

1/24/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 06/08/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

1/24/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketTR - Motion for Joinder - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketTR - Demurrer to Complaint - Overruled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Defendant Robinson's Demurrer and Defendant Smith's Joinder to Demurrer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 07/02/2020 01:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 07/02/2020 01:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/02/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Case Management Conference and order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of assignment of Judge for all Purposes Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgement of Receipt of Transferred Case. New Case #

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgement of Receipt of Transferred Case. New Case #

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/08/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less