Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/19/2020 at 02:10:11 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank N.A. VS Herrera

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 Wells Fargo Bank N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Herrera. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RONNI MACLAREN and VICTORIA S. KOLAKOWSKI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9708

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

RONNI MACLAREN

VICTORIA S. KOLAKOWSKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendants and Debtor / Appellees

HERRERA , ALICIA

HERRERA, ALICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MARQUEZ, MARK

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

6/15/2020: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

Proposed Judgment Received

6/15/2020: Proposed Judgment Received

Judgment Stipulated Before Trial Filed

6/16/2020: Judgment Stipulated Before Trial Filed

Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

5/21/2020: Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

Proof of Service -Stipulation for Judgment Filed

5/21/2020: Proof of Service -Stipulation for Judgment Filed

Proposed Judgment Received

5/21/2020: Proposed Judgment Received

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Granted

5/28/2020: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Granted

Hearing Reset to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 05/28/2020 09:00 AM D- 512

4/10/2020: Hearing Reset to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 05/28/2020 09:00 AM D- 512

Hearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 07/01/2020 09:00 AM D- 512

1/27/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 07/01/2020 09:00 AM D- 512

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

1/15/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Wells Fargo Bank N.A. Filed

11/21/2019: Case Management Statement of Wells Fargo Bank N.A. Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/17/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/17/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Alicia Herrera

9/13/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Alicia Herrera

Initial Case Management Conference 12/17/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

9/16/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 12/17/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

9/16/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Complaint - Collections Filed

8/2/2019: Complaint - Collections Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

8/2/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Stipulated Before Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Judgment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Attorney Fee Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Judge: Victoria S. Kolakowski; Department: Dept 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Judgment on the Pleadings Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/17/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Alicia Herrera Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Alicia Herrera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Alicia Herrera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Alicia Herrera Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Collections Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARQUEZ, MARK