This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 15:54:45 (UTC).

Welch VS City of Oakland

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 Welch filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Oakland. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Dennis Hayashi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2305

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Dennis Hayashi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Myisha Welch

Defendants

CITY OF OAKLAND

East Oakland Community Project

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Courtney Herrity O'Brien

JOSEPH J. MINIOZA

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 06/09/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

9/13/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 06/09/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

Request for Dismissal

04/20/2022: Request for Dismissal

RETURNED MAIL Order re: Hearing on Demurrer

03/22/2022: RETURNED MAIL Order re: Hearing on Demurrer

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

03/22/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

03/22/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Certificate of Mailing for [Order re: Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)]

03/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for [Order re: Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)]

Order re: Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

03/10/2022: Order re: Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

03/10/2022: Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

Reply Reply/Declaration in support of Defendant City of Oakland's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint

03/03/2022: Reply Reply/Declaration in support of Defendant City of Oakland's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

02/25/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

02/01/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

02/01/2022: Answer

RETURNED MAIL Initial Case Management Conference 06/09/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

11/29/2021: RETURNED MAIL Initial Case Management Conference 06/09/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

Declaration in Support of Demurrer

11/02/2021: Declaration in Support of Demurrer

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/02/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

11/02/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Declaration of Service by Mail

09/09/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Proof of Service Personal Service Filed

10/07/2021: Proof of Service Personal Service Filed

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: On the Complaint filed by Welch on 09/09/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Myisha Welch as to East Oakland Community Project; Category: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: Myisha Welch (Plaintiff) As to: Myisha Welch (Plaintiff); City of Oakland (Defendant); East Oakland Community Project (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketMessage: RETURNED MAIL Order re: Hearing on Demurrer Filed by: Clerk As to: Myisha Welch (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- East Oakland Community Project (Defendant):Organization Name changed from Esst Oakland Commuity Project to East Oakland Community Project; Category: Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketMessage: RETURNED MAIL Order re: Hearing on Demurrer Filed by: Clerk As to: City of Oakland (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by: City of Oakland (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by: City of Oakland (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 03/10/2022 at 02:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 518 updated: Result Date to 03/10/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: Certificate of Mailing for [Order re: Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)] Issued and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order re: Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketMessage: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by: City of Oakland (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service Personal Service Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 06/09/2022 02:30 PM D- 518; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Service by Mail; Category: DSM002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Myisha Welch Granted; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Myisha Welch; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Myisha Welch; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Civil Rights Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less