This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/31/2022 at 12:05:21 (UTC).

WEBBER vs U-HAUL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 WEBBER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against U-HAUL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Wiley W Manuel Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Joscelyn Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2374

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Joscelyn Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cora Webber

Defendant

U-Haul Corporation

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

06/01/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Request to Waive Court Fees

06/08/2022: Request to Waive Court Fees

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

06/10/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: NOTE: Certified Mail Receipt # 7021 0350 0001 7814 4692; Category: Case Note

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): Status Date changed from 06/09/2022 to 06/10/2022 Status changed from Pending in WQ to Filed; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Pending in WQ by:; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result: Granted Result Date: 06/09/2022; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMessage: Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 10/03/2022 at 09:00 AM in Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse at Department 105; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMessage: Request to Waive Court Fees Filed by: Cora Webber (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case assigned to Hon. Joscelyn Jones in Department 105 Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse; Category: Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketMessage: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Filed by: Cora Webber (Plaintiff) As to: U-Haul Corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U-Haul Co of Colorado is a litigant