This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/27/2020 at 01:55:59 (UTC).

WASHINGTON VS FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 WASHINGTON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NOL WISE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5598

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WASHINGTON, LOUIS

WASHINGTON, PATRICIA

Defendants

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

STEELE, JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/2/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/2/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION Filed

9/16/2020: Case Management Statement of FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION Filed

Case Management Statement of FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION Filed

6/29/2020: Case Management Statement of FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/7/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service Filed

3/2/2020: Proof of Service Filed

Declaration of nonmonetary status Filed

3/2/2020: Declaration of nonmonetary status Filed

Notice of of Quality's declaration of nonmonetary status Filed

3/2/2020: Notice of of Quality's declaration of nonmonetary status Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION Filed

3/3/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION Filed

3/3/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. Filed

3/3/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS

3/6/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 07/13/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

4/15/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 07/13/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

Initial Case Management Conference 04/20/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

12/5/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 04/20/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

12/5/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

12/4/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for PATRICIA WASHINGTON

12/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for PATRICIA WASHINGTON

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

12/4/2019: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment Reservation Set for dept: 24 date: 01/14/2021 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 12/09/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 10/02/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of nonmonetary status Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Quality's declaration of nonmonetary status Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/20/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for PATRICIA WASHINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less