This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 20:41:40 (UTC).

Waquia VS JAMV, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 Waquia filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JAMV, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Stephen Kaus. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1253

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Stephen Kaus

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maceo Waquia

Mimi Green

Defendant

JAMV, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mel M.C. Cole

Richard H. Rahm

Sepideh Ardestani

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/15/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/7/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/7/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/15/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/15/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice Notice of Entry

11/12/2021: Notice Notice of Entry

Notice Notice of Entry of Order

11/12/2021: Notice Notice of Entry of Order

Order re: Compliance Hearing

11/09/2021: Order re: Compliance Hearing

Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)

11/09/2021: Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)

Supplemental Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Jarrod Salinas regarding Disbursement

10/25/2021: Supplemental Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Jarrod Salinas regarding Disbursement

Declaration of Service by Mail

03/29/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

03/15/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration in Support

02/19/2021: Declaration in Support

Declaration in Support

02/19/2021: Declaration in Support

Proposed Order

02/19/2021: Proposed Order

Proof of Service on Motion

02/19/2021: Proof of Service on Motion

Declaration

02/19/2021: Declaration

Declaration

02/19/2021: Declaration

228 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice Notice of Entry Filed by: Maceo Waquia (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice Notice of Entry of Order Filed by: Maceo Waquia (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 19; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMessage: Order re: Compliance Hearing Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Compliance Hearing); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketMessage: Supplemental Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Jarrod Salinas regarding Disbursement Filed by: Maceo Waquia (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing 11/09/2021 03:00 PM D- 19; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference Order Issued; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed; Category: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketMessage: Declaration Regarding Disbursement Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complex Determination Hearing set on Court's Own Motion; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketMessage: Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Filed for Maceo Waquia, Mimi Green; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service by Mail Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for JAMV, Inc.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to JAMV, Inc. Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 05/20/2019 09:00 AM D- 25; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Maceo Waquia; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other Employment Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jamv, Inc. dba Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, a California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLE, MEL M.C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARDESTANI SEPIDEH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAHM RICHARD HOWARD