This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/26/2021 at 03:54:16 (UTC).

Wang VS Zhang

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 Wang filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Zhang. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELENA CONDES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9008

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELENA CONDES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WANG, MINGLI

Respondent

ZHANG, ZHAO HAO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DAO, LOAN

LIU, ARTHUR J.

WONG, CATHERINE Y.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 516; Action: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 516; Action: Family Law Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 504; Action: Settlement Conference - Family Law

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSettlement Conference Referral Form Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSettlement Conference - Family Law 03/02/2022 09:00 AM D- 504

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Family Law Status Conference; Judge: Elena Condes; Department: Dept 516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Family Law Long-Cause Hearing 04/06/2022 09:00 AM D- 516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Family Law Long-Cause Hearing 09/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Status Conference 03/07/2022 01:30 PM D- 516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Status Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketRFO - Family Law Hearing Confirmed for dept: 516 date: 03/11/2021 time: 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketSeparate Property Declaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCommunity and Quasi-Community Property Declaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order re:... Spousal Support,.. Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration Filed for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketResponse to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed for Zhao Hao Zhang

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketSeparate Property Declaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCommunity and Quasi-Community Property Declaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketSummons on Petition Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WONG, CATHERINE Y.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIU, ARTHUR J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAO, LOAN