Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/09/2021 at 07:49:36 (UTC).

Walker VS Peet's Coffee, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Walker filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Peet's Coffee, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5499

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALKER , DOUGLAS

Defendant

PEET'S COFFEE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LEE, LARRY W.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference 06/15/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

4/20/2021: Case Management Conference 06/15/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

4/15/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Douglas Walker

4/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Douglas Walker

Complaint - Other Employment Filed

4/15/2021: Complaint - Other Employment Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 23; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 23; Action: Complaint - Other Employment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 06/15/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 05/18/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Douglas Walker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peets Coffee Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE, LARRY W