This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/08/2020 at 17:25:07 (UTC).

WADE VS MEAD AVENUE HOUSING ASSOCIATES L.P.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2017 WADE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MEAD AVENUE HOUSING ASSOCIATES L P. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRAD SELIGMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4188

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRAD SELIGMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WASHINGTON, AJAUN

WADE, AJA

WASHINGTON, AJAUNA

MYERS, RICHARD

WRIGHT, IRA

WASHINGTON, ANZA

HARRIS, MARCELIO

LEARY, FREDDIE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

UROJAS COMMUNITY SERVICES

KIM, KEITH

HOUSE OF CHANGE, INC.

DIGNITY HOUSE WEST INC.

MEAD AVENUE HOUSING ASSOCIATES L.P.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

KIM, KEITH

MEAD AVENUE HOUSING ASSOCIATES L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

VARLACK, TIEGA-NOEL

MARCHI, ROBERT W.

LAUDERDALE, ANDREW M

NEVIN, JEFFREY G.

HONG, WOOKSUN

KRONENBERG, WILLIAM S

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 10/30/2017 09:00 AM D- 24

6/19/2017: Initial Case Management Conference 10/30/2017 09:00 AM D- 24

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/20/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/20/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Motion For Appointment of Filed for Plaintiff

8/21/2019: Motion For Appointment of Filed for Plaintiff

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

9/17/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion For Appointment of Granted

9/17/2019: Motion For Appointment of Granted

Attendance Sheet Filed

9/17/2019: Attendance Sheet Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/24/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/24/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/29/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/29/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party House of Change, Inc. Filed

11/8/2019: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party House of Change, Inc. Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to House of Change, Inc. Rejected

11/8/2019: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to House of Change, Inc. Rejected

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party House of Change, Inc. Filed

11/8/2019: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party House of Change, Inc. Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/12/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/12/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/19/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/19/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 23; Action: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 07/15/2020 09:01 AM D- 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
155 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/30/2017 09:00 AM D- 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to AJAUN WASHINGTON Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for AJAUN WASHINGTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to AJAUNA WASHINGTON Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for AJAUNA WASHINGTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for AJAUN WASHINGTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for AJAUNA WASHINGTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for AJA WADE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed (Amended)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEAD AVENUE HOUSING ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEVIN, JEFFREY G

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HONG, WOOKSUN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert W. Marchi