This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 09:20:46 (UTC).

Villarroel VS Autoplus

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 Villarroel filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Autoplus. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS HAYASHI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4542

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DENNIS HAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLARROEL , HECTOR

Defendant

AUTOPLUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RUBKE, MARK E.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/19/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/19/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Hector Villarroel Filed

7/30/2021: Case Management Statement of Hector Villarroel Filed

Tentative Case Management Order

8/5/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Initial Case Management Conference 08/19/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

4/9/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 08/19/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/9/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

4/6/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hector Villarroel

4/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hector Villarroel

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

4/6/2021: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 518; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Dennis Hayashi; Department: Dept 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 11/18/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Hector Villarroel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/19/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hector Villarroel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBKE, MARK E.