This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 04:25:51 (UTC).

Villanueva VS Ng

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 Villanueva filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Ng. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EVELIO GRILLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5004

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

EVELIO GRILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLANUEVA , ALLAN A.

Defendants

WONG AND DAO, LLP

NG, MARY

OHANA HAWAIIAN BBQ, INC.

CHANG, VANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DAO, LOAN

FISCH, GREGG A.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/11/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/11/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/29/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/29/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 04/29/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

9/30/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 04/29/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Vance Chang, Wong and Dao, LLP Filed

4/1/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Vance Chang, Wong and Dao, LLP Filed

Dismissal As to Defendant: Vance Chang, Wong and Dao, LLP Entered

4/7/2021: Dismissal As to Defendant: Vance Chang, Wong and Dao, LLP Entered

First Amended Complaint Filed

2/11/2021: First Amended Complaint Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Re: 1st Amended Complaint Filed

2/11/2021: Proof of Service by Mail Re: 1st Amended Complaint Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

1/12/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend

1/12/2021: Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend

Order Setting Aside Default Filed

1/12/2021: Order Setting Aside Default Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

12/29/2020: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

Rejection Letter Issued on Motion for Joinder

12/31/2020: Rejection Letter Issued on Motion for Joinder

Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint Filed

1/6/2021: Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

1/6/2021: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

1/6/2021: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Declaration of Demurring Party in support of Automatic Extension Filed by Mary Ng, Ohana Hawaiian BB

11/12/2020: Declaration of Demurring Party in support of Automatic Extension Filed by Mary Ng, Ohana Hawaiian BB

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/11/2021 01:30 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Vance Chang, Wong and Dao, LLP Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Vance Chang, Wong and Dao, LLP Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Wong and Dao, LLP Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party Mary Ng, Ohana Hawaiian BBQ, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Ohana Hawaiian BBQ, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Mary Ng Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in support of Automatic Extension Filed by Mary Ng, Ohana Hawaiian BB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/29/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Allan A. Villanueva

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAO, LOAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISCH, GREGG A.