This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 06:17:16 (UTC).

VILLALOBOS, et al. vs ARVINMERITOR, INC, et al.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 VILLALOBOS, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ARVINMERITOR, INC,. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Richard Seabolt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9351

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Richard Seabolt

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

ARVINMERITOR, INC

BARRETTS MINERALS INC

BLOCK DRUG COMPANY, INC

BWDAC, INC

CARLISLE INDUSTRIAL BRAKE & FRICTION, INC. f/k/a MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC.

CHATTEM INC

COTY, INC.

DEERE & COMPANY

DORSETT & JACKSON, INC

EATON CORPORATION, as Successor-in-Interest to CUTLER-HAMMAR, INC.

Ernestina R Villalobos

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., f/k/a ALLIED SIGNAL, INC., individually and as successor-in-interest to the BENDIX CORPORATION, BENDIX AVIATION CORP., and THE SIGNAL COMPANIES, INC., f/k/a SIGNAL OIL & GAS COMPANY

INDUCTOTHERM CORP

INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION f/k/a THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY

KUBOTA TRACTOR CORPORATION

Luis B Villalobos

MORSE TEC LLC f/k/a BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to BORGWARNER CORPORATION

NORTON COMPANY

PFIZER, INC

40 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Notice NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE (throughout case)

02/16/2023: Notice NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE (throughout case)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

01/18/2023: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Answer

01/25/2023: Answer

Answer

01/25/2023: Answer

Answer

01/20/2023: Answer

Case Management Order

01/13/2023: Case Management Order

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

01/13/2023: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Request for Dismissal

01/11/2023: Request for Dismissal

Answer

12/29/2022: Answer

Answer

12/29/2022: Answer

Answer

12/29/2022: Answer

Answer

12/29/2022: Answer

Answer

12/28/2022: Answer

Notice NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

12/29/2022: Notice NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/28/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/29/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/28/2022: Case Management Statement

131 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketMessage: Notice NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE (throughout case) Filed by: WHITTAKER, CLARK & DANIELS, INC (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: DORSETT & JACKSON, INC (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: SAFEWAY INC (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: BLOCK DRUG COMPANY, INC (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketMessage: On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Lorena V. Acosta, et al. on 11/16/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Lorena V. Acosta, Lorena V. Acosta, and Ernestina R Villalobos, causes Third & Fourth Causes of Action; Category: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by: WHITTAKER, CLARK & DANIELS, INC (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
149 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order DESIGNATING CASE COMPLEX Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Payment of Advanced Jury Fee Filed by: Luis B Villalobos (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case assigned to Hon. Jo-Lynne Lee in Department 18 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse; Category: Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: The case is placed in special status of: Asbestos; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: The case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Luis B Villalobos (Plaintiff); Ernestina R Villalobos (Plaintiff) As to: David Lee Amell (Attorney); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Luis B Villalobos (Plaintiff); Ernestina R Villalobos (Plaintiff) As to: David Lee Amell (Attorney); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Filed by: Luis B Villalobos (Plaintiff); Ernestina R Villalobos (Plaintiff) As to: David Lee Amell (Attorney); ARVINMERITOR, INC (Defendant); BARRETTS MINERALS INC (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less