This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 11:00:30 (UTC).

VHS Liquidating Trust VS Blue Cross of California

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 VHS Liquidating Trust filed a Probate - Trust lawsuit against Blue Cross of California. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Winifred Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6600

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Winifred Smith

 

Party Details

Defendants

ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY

ANTHEM HEALTH PLANS OF KENTUCKY, INC.

ANTHEM HEALTH PLANS OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, INC.

ANTHEM HEALTH PLANS OF VIRGINIA, INC.

ANTHEM, HEALTH PLANS OF MAINE, INC.

ANTHEM, INC

ANTHEM, INSURANCE COMPANIES, INC.

BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF ALABAMA

BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF GEORGIA

BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ARIZONA, INC.

BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF WISCONSIN

BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA

CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS' SERVICE

COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

EMPIRE HEALTHCHOICE ASSURANCE, INC.

HEALTHY ALLIANCE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

HIGHMARK HEALTH SERVICES AND HIGHMARK INC.

HMO MISSOURI INC.

PREMERA AND PREMERA BLUE CROSS

RIGHTCHOICE MANAGED CARE, INC.

62 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Brittany Nicole DeJong

Chad Eric DeVeaux

Christopher James Cox

Christopher Kelly

Craig Alan Hoover

Harmony Roselina Gbe

John Cove

Macaulay W. Ivory

Marisa C Livesay

Michael Angel Naranjo

Patrick O'Shaughnessy

Tracy Eila Reichmuth

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference 10/07/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

7/30/2021: Case Management Conference 10/07/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

Miscellaneous - Other (Name Extension) Demurring Defendants' Demonstrative Exhibit from May 27, 2022 Hearing on Motion to Strike

05/25/2022: Miscellaneous - Other (Name Extension) Demurring Defendants' Demonstrative Exhibit from May 27, 2022 Hearing on Motion to Strike

Scheduling Order For supplemental Briefing on Motion to Quash

05/25/2022: Scheduling Order For supplemental Briefing on Motion to Quash

Miscellaneous - Other (Name Extension) PLAINTIFFS SHORT SUMMARY OF RELEVANT DATES AS TO PROVIDER, ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES ONLY, AND SUBSCRIBER CLAIMS FOR PURPOSES OF EQUITABLE TOLLING

05/24/2022: Miscellaneous - Other (Name Extension) PLAINTIFFS SHORT SUMMARY OF RELEVANT DATES AS TO PROVIDER, ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES ONLY, AND SUBSCRIBER CLAIMS FOR PURPOSES OF EQUITABLE TOLLING

Request for Judicial Notice

05/24/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

05/24/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Attendance Sheet

05/24/2022: Attendance Sheet

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

05/20/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order for Supplemental Briefing on Motion to Quash

05/19/2022: Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order for Supplemental Briefing on Motion to Quash

Order on Scheduling of Hearing on Pro Hac Vice Application of David A. Markewitz

05/19/2022: Order on Scheduling of Hearing on Pro Hac Vice Application of David A. Markewitz

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

05/18/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

05/18/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

05/18/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

05/18/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

05/18/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

05/18/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

05/18/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

05/18/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

558 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Miscellaneous - Other (Name Extension) Demurring Defendants' Demonstrative Exhibit from May 27, 2022 Hearing on Motion to Strike Filed by: Bluecross Blue Shield Of Tennessee, Inc. (Plaintiff); The Blue Cross And Blue Shield Association (Plaintiff); California Physicians' Service (Defendant); Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama (Defendant); Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. (Defendant); Carefirst, Inc. (Defendant); Guidewell Mutual Holding Corporation (Defendant); Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. (Defendant); Hawaii Medical Service Association (Defendant); Health Care Service Corporation (Defendant); Blue Cross And Blue Shield Of Montana (Defendant); Blue Cross And Blue Shield Of New Mexico (Defendant); Blue Cross And Blue Shield Of Oklahoma (Defendant); Blue Cross And Blue Shield Of Texas, Inc. (Defendant); Wellmark, Inc. (Defendant); Wellmark Blue Cross And Blue Shield Of Iowa (Defendant); Blue Cross And Blue Shield Of Massachusetts, Inc. (Defendant); Blue Cross And Blue Shield Of North Carolina, Inc. (Defendant); Group Hospitalization And Medical Services, Inc. (Defendant); CareFirst of Maryland, Inc. (Defendant); CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc. (Defendant); Caring for Montanans, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Scheduling Order For supplemental Briefing on Motion to Quash Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Miscellaneous - Other (Name Extension) PLAINTIFFS SHORT SUMMARY OF RELEVANT DATES AS TO PROVIDER, ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES ONLY, AND SUBSCRIBER CLAIMS FOR PURPOSES OF EQUITABLE TOLLING Filed by: VHS Liquidating Trust (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Foundation, Inc. (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Management, Inc. (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: VHS Liquidating Trust (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Foundation, Inc. (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Management, Inc. (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: VHS Liquidating Trust (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Foundation, Inc. (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Management, Inc. (Plaintiff) As to: VHS Liquidating Trust (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Foundation, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Attendance Sheet Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Blue CrossClue Shield Wyoming (Plaintiff); Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc. (Defendant); Blue Shield And Blue Cross Of Kansas, Inc. (Defendant); Blue Cross And Blue Shield Of Kansas City (Defendant); Goodlife Partners, Inc. (Defendant); Blue Cross And Blue Shield Of Nebraska (Defendant); Healthnow Systems, Inc. (Defendant); Healthnow New York, Inc. (Defendant); Noridian Mutual Insurance Comapny And Healthy Dakota Mutual Holdings (Defendant) As to: VHS Liquidating Trust (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); Prime Healthcare Foundation, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMessage: Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order for Supplemental Briefing on Motion to Quash Filed and Received by: VHS Liquidating Trust (Plaintiff); Blue CrossClue Shield Wyoming (Plaintiff); Premera and Premera Blue Cross (Defendant); Usable Mutual Insurance Company (Defendant); Regence Blueshield of Idaho, Inc. (Defendant); Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc. (Defendant); Blue Shield And Blue Cross Of Kansas, Inc. (Defendant); Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company (Defendant); Blue Cross & Blue Shield Of Mississippi (Defendant); Blue Cross And Blue Shield Of Kansas City (Defendant); Goodlife Partners, Inc. (Defendant); Blue Cross And Blue Shield Of Nebraska (Defendant); Healthnow Systems, Inc. (Defendant); Healthnow New York, Inc. (Defendant); Lifetime Healthcare, Inc. (Defendant); Excellus Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant); Noridian Mutual Insurance Comapny And Healthy Dakota Mutual Holdings (Defendant); Capital Blue Cross (Defendant); Independence Health Group, Inc. (Defendant); Independence Hospital Indemnity Plan, Inc. (Defendant) As to: VHS Liquidating Trust (Plaintiff); Blue CrossClue Shield Wyoming (Plaintiff); Premera and Premera Blue Cross (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order on Scheduling of Hearing on Pro Hac Vice Application of David A. Markewitz Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons scheduled for 07/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/26/2022 10:00 AM; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
600 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service by Mail Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 10/07/2021 09:00 AM D- 21; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complex Determination Hearing 09/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 21; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketMessage: First Amended Complaint Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons Issued and Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMessage: Plaintiffs' Application in Support of Request for Complex Designation Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for VHS Liquidating Trust; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Antitrust/Trade Regulation Filed (Amended); Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less