This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 06:12:58 (UTC).

Vellichor Inc VS NuMark Transportation

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 Vellichor Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NuMark Transportation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8329

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VELLICHOR INC

VELLICHOR INC, XIANLIANG LIU

Defendants

NUMARK TRANSPORTATION

NUMARK TRANSPORTATION, CASEY AALTO (PRESIDENT)

 

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial Filed

8/5/2021: Request to Postpone Trial Filed

Amended Complaint- Plaitiff's Address needed to be amended. All other amendments requested were made

5/25/2021: Amended Complaint- Plaitiff's Address needed to be amended. All other amendments requested were made

Amendment to Claim of Plaintiff Filed

4/29/2021: Amendment to Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/30/2021 01:30 PM D- 519

5/27/2021: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/30/2021 01:30 PM D- 519

Amendment to Claim of Plaintiff Filed

6/9/2021: Amendment to Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Letter from Vellichor, Xianliang Liu Filed

6/9/2021: Letter from Vellichor, Xianliang Liu Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 06/16/2021 09:00 AM D- 519

4/16/2021: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 06/16/2021 09:00 AM D- 519

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

2/10/2021: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 519; Action: Claim of Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 12/06/2021 01:30 PM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter from Vellichor, Xianliang Liu Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/30/2021 01:30 PM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint- Plaitiff's Address needed to be amended. All other amendments requested were made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 06/16/2021 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 04/16/2021 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NUMARK TRANSPORTATION is a litigant