This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/17/2021 at 00:53:21 (UTC).

Vasques VS 3M Company

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Vasques filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JO-LYNNE Q. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2330

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VASQUES, LESLIE TOY

VASQUES, LAWRENCE J.

Defendants

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

3M COMPANY

THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY

EMIGH HARDWARE CO.

THE SCOTTS COMPANY LLC

PFIZER INC.

THE TILE COUNCIL OF NORTH AMERICA

BWDAC, INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

ACE HARDWARE CORPORATION

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

PPG ARCHITECTURAL FINISHES, INC.

HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, INC.

AEROJET ROCKETDYNE HOLDINGS INC

BORG WARNER MORSE TEC INC.

TRUITT AND WHITE LUMBER COMPANY

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JONES, H.W. TREY

WILLIAMSON, IAN G

PRZETAK, LAURA

OBERG, LISA L.

BRYDON, JOHN R.

GARDINER, KATHERINE P

RUIZ, FERLIN P.

CHAN, MACY M.

FAHR, SAMANTHA

LAZARUS ESQ, LISA H

HUGO, EDWARD R.

MCCAFFERY, TIMOTHY J.

KUM, ROBERT

LANKFORD, PAUL V.

HARAN, GINA A

KIRKPATRICK, HEATHER SWEENEY

CHAVES, MARISA R.

TAPP, CHAD S.

REEG, ANA T.

CHEW, KIMBERLY

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/30/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/30/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

4/23/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/19/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/19/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

2/15/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/1/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/1/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

2/2/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for DCo LLC

5/3/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for DCo LLC

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for BWDAC, Inc.

5/3/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for BWDAC, Inc.

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for O'Reilly Automotive, Inc

5/3/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for O'Reilly Automotive, Inc

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Hennessy Industries, Inc.

5/4/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Hennessy Industries, Inc.

Proof of Service by Mail on Deft's Answer to Pltff's First Amended Complaint Filed

5/4/2021: Proof of Service by Mail on Deft's Answer to Pltff's First Amended Complaint Filed

Case Management Statement of Lawrence J. Vasques, Leslie Toy Vasques Filed

4/14/2021: Case Management Statement of Lawrence J. Vasques, Leslie Toy Vasques Filed

Notice of Change of Address Filed

4/15/2021: Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Lead Attorney Filed for 3M Company

4/19/2021: Notice of Change of Lead Attorney Filed for 3M Company

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Emigh Hardware Co.

4/26/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Emigh Hardware Co.

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 18; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail on Deft's Answer to Pltff's First Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Hennessy Industries, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for O'Reilly Automotive, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for BWDAC, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for DCo LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jo-Lynne Q. Lee; Department: Dept 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 07/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Hennessy Industries, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 08/14/2020 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lawrence J. Vasques

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRUITT AND WHITE LUMBER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where THE TILE COUNCIL OF NORTH AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where AEROJET ROCKETDYNE HOLDINGS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMIGH HARDWARE CO. is a litigant