Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/15/2020 at 07:29:41 (UTC).

USF Bestway Transportation Inc VS Island Cargo Consolidator

Case Summary

On 06/12/1997 USF Bestway Transportation Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Island Cargo Consolidator. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Wiley W Manuel Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PHILIP V. SARKISIAN, GAIL BREWSTER BEREOLA, TALLY CRAIG and TALLY CRAIG -. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2782

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wiley W Manuel Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

PHILIP V. SARKISIAN

GAIL BREWSTER BEREOLA

TALLY CRAIG

TALLY CRAIG -

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

USF BESTWAY TRANSPORTATION INC

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

ISLAND CARGO CONSOLIDATORS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JACOBSON, LAWRENCE A.

WAYNE, LARRY D

 

Court Documents

Complaint Breach of Contract Filed

6/12/1997: Complaint Breach of Contract Filed

Summons with Proof of Service As to Island Cargo Consolidators Inc Filed

8/25/1997: Summons with Proof of Service As to Island Cargo Consolidators Inc Filed

Request for Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered

9/18/1997: Request for Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered

Judgment Entered

9/18/1997: Judgment Entered

Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied Filed

1/9/1998: Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied Filed

Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories Filed for Plaintiff

4/10/1998: Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories Filed for Plaintiff

Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed

4/23/1998: Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed

Rejection Letter Issued on -

5/1/1998: Rejection Letter Issued on -

Response To OSC Filed

5/11/1998: Response To OSC Filed

Rejection Letter Issued on Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585)

6/25/1998: Rejection Letter Issued on Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585)

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

7/7/1998: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

Motion to Strike Answer Filed for Plaintiff

7/13/1998: Motion to Strike Answer Filed for Plaintiff

Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed

8/17/1998: Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed

Motion to Continue Trial Date Filed for Plaintiff

11/12/1998: Motion to Continue Trial Date Filed for Plaintiff

Rejection Letter Issued on Stipulation for Judgment

2/3/1999: Rejection Letter Issued on Stipulation for Judgment

Declaration of Ramona Lokken Filed by USF Bestway Transportation Inc

3/5/1999: Declaration of Ramona Lokken Filed by USF Bestway Transportation Inc

Judgment Stipulated Before Trial Filed

3/5/1999: Judgment Stipulated Before Trial Filed

Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

3/18/1999: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/1999
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued To Alameda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Stipulation for Judgment Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Stipulated Before Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Ramona Lokken Filed by USF Bestway Transportation Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/1999
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Stipulation for Judgment Filed for USF Bestway Transportation Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Stipulation for Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Continuation of Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/1997
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued To San Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/1997
  • DocketRequest for Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As to Island Cargo Consolidators Inc Entere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/1997
  • DocketSummons with Proof of Service Valid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Filed for Island Cargo Consolidators Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration CCp 171.5 and CCP 585.5 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons with Proof of Service As to Island Cargo Consolidators Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/1997
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract Filed

    Read MoreRead Less