This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/04/2020 at 12:09:11 (UTC).

Uncle Credit Union VS Lodderhose

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Uncle Credit Union filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Lodderhose. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NOL WISE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1774

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNCLE CREDIT UNION

Defendant

LODDERHOSE , GRETCHEN L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SILVERMAN, TIMOTHY J

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/31/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service by Mail on Case Management Statement Filed

8/11/2020: Proof of Service by Mail on Case Management Statement Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Gretchen L. Lodderhose Filed

7/23/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Gretchen L. Lodderhose Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Uncle Credit Union , Gretchen L. Lodderhose Filed

7/8/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Uncle Credit Union , Gretchen L. Lodderhose Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/24/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Application for Writ of Possession Granted in Part

6/4/2020: Application for Writ of Possession Granted in Part

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

6/5/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gretchen L. Lodderhose Filed

5/11/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gretchen L. Lodderhose Filed

Application for Writ of Possession Taken Under Submission

6/4/2020: Application for Writ of Possession Taken Under Submission

Case Management Statement of Uncle Credit Union Filed

5/13/2020: Case Management Statement of Uncle Credit Union Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gretchen L. Lodderhose Filed

5/27/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gretchen L. Lodderhose Filed

Application for Writ of Possession - Motion Rescheduled

5/28/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Motion Rescheduled

Hearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 05/28/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

4/8/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 05/28/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

Application for Writ of Possession Filed for Plaintiff

3/6/2020: Application for Writ of Possession Filed for Plaintiff

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

1/24/2020: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Uncle Credit Union

1/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Uncle Credit Union

Statement of Venue Filed

1/24/2020: Statement of Venue Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 06/08/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

1/28/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 06/08/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 12/09/2020 09:01 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail on Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Uncle Credit Union Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Gretchen L. Lodderhose Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party Gretchen L. Lodderhose Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Gretchen L. Lodderhose Rejected

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party Uncle Credit Union , Gretchen L. Lodderhose Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Gretchen L. Lodderhose Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 05/28/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession Hearing Confirmed for 04/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/08/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Uncle Credit Union

    Read MoreRead Less