This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 08:12:25 (UTC).

Tuttle VS County of Alameda

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Tuttle filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against County of Alameda. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0305

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TUTTLE, MELONIE PATRICE

Defendants

ALAMEDA COUNTY PUBLIC WORKS AGENCY

COUNTY OF ALAMEDA

PAM, BORIS RENARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DOUGLASS, JAKE

MACKAY, RAYMOND L

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Boris Renard Pam Filed

9/14/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Boris Renard Pam Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to County of Alameda Filed

9/23/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to County of Alameda Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for County of Alameda, Boris Renard Pam

10/1/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for County of Alameda, Boris Renard Pam

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alameda County Public Works Agency Filed

10/1/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alameda County Public Works Agency Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

8/23/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

8/23/2021: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Melonie Patrice Tuttle

8/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Melonie Patrice Tuttle

Notice of Of Posting Jury Fees Filed

8/23/2021: Notice of Of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 04/04/2022 02:30 PM D- 22

8/24/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 04/04/2022 02:30 PM D- 22

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8/24/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Alameda County Public Works Agency Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for County of Alameda, Boris Renard Pam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to County of Alameda Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Boris Renard Pam Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/04/2022 02:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Melonie Patrice Tuttle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACKAY, RAYMOND L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUGLASS JAKE