Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/23/2021 at 06:58:00 (UTC).

Tsuji VS Content Management Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 Tsuji filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Content Management Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4434

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TSUJI, ZACHARY

Defendant

CONTENT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MULLER, DANIEL J

BRUNO, MICHAEL D.

 

Court Documents

Answer to Complaint Filed for Content Management Corporation

12/2/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Content Management Corporation

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Content Management Corporation Filed

10/22/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Content Management Corporation Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 05/18/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

9/25/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 05/18/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

9/25/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

9/15/2020: Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Zachary Tsuji

9/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Zachary Tsuji

Summons on Complaint Issued

9/15/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Content Management Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Content Management Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 05/18/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Zachary Tsuji Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Zachary Tsuji

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Zachary Tsuji

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Jerome Muller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruno, Michael D.