This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 02:04:25 (UTC).

Trummer VS Lim

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 Trummer filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Lim. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD SEABOLT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5341

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD SEABOLT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUMMER, JOSEPH

Defendant

LIM, KIMGUECH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CHENG, DORIS

PATERSON, NAIRI

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

4/2/2021: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Joseph Trummer

4/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Joseph Trummer

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

4/2/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/19/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 08/16/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

4/19/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 08/16/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kimguech Lim Filed

5/4/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kimguech Lim Filed

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

6/16/2021: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Kimguech Lim

6/16/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Kimguech Lim

Case Management Statement of Joseph Trummer Filed

7/30/2021: Case Management Statement of Joseph Trummer Filed

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

7/16/2021: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/16/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/16/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Kimguech Lim Filed

8/12/2021: Case Management Statement of Kimguech Lim Filed

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 04/26/2023 09:00 AM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 03/21/2023 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 05/12/2023 10:00 AM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketReferred to Private Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Joseph Trummer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Kimguech Lim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Kimguech Lim Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/16/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Joseph Trummer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHENG, DORIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATERSON, NAIRI