Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/24/2021 at 09:08:07 (UTC).

Tran VS Doe

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 Tran filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RONNI MACLAREN and JAMES REILLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7927

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

RONNI MACLAREN

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAN, RAYMOND

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOE, BRANDON

HUANG, ABEL C

DOES, WILL

HUEY, CAROLINE MANLI

REYNOSA, LACEY

DOE, WILL

LLEWELLYN, GIANNINA

LLEWELLYN, WILLIAM

SWEET, BRANDON

Cross Defendant

CHAN, LEON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FETTO, JOHN A.

MARTIN, KEVIN R

GRISWOLD, TIMOTHY A.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/22/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/19/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/19/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/19/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/19/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Raymond Tran Filed

1/8/2021: Case Management Statement of Raymond Tran Filed

Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Raymond Tran

10/20/2020: Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Raymond Tran

Case Management Statement of Raymond Tran Filed

10/23/2020: Case Management Statement of Raymond Tran Filed

Notice of Change of Address Filed

10/6/2020: Notice of Change of Address Filed

Case Management Statement of Raymond Tran Filed

9/16/2020: Case Management Statement of Raymond Tran Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/13/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Brandon Doe Filed

3/4/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Brandon Doe Filed

Cross-Complaint Filed for Abel C Huang, Caroline Manli Huey

1/14/2020: Cross-Complaint Filed for Abel C Huang, Caroline Manli Huey

Summons Issued and Filed

1/14/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/2/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 12/04/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

7/24/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 12/04/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

7/24/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/04/2022 11:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 08/15/2022 09:30 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 08/04/2022 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 07/18/2022 09:00 AM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 05/18/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Caroline Manli Huey, Abel C Huang

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Abel C Huang, Caroline Manli Huey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/21/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Raymond Tran Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/04/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Raymond Tran

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRISWOLD, TIMOTHY A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN, KEVIN R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FETTO JOHN A.