This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/09/2020 at 10:07:40 (UTC).

Torres VS Alameda Health System

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 Torres filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Alameda Health System. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA SPAIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4658

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA SPAIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TORRES , LETICIA

TORRES , LUIS

Defendants

HORNER , KATHRYN

ALAMEDA HEALTH SYSTEM

HORNER, KATHRYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CARTER, BRIAN M.

TRAVELSTEAD, TIMOTHY C.

 

Court Documents

First Amended Complaint Filed

6/9/2020: First Amended Complaint Filed

Statement of non-opposition re; demurrer to plaintiff's first amended complaint Filed

5/12/2020: Statement of non-opposition re; demurrer to plaintiff's first amended complaint Filed

Statement of non-opposition re; motion to strike plaintiff's first amended complaint Filed

5/12/2020: Statement of non-opposition re; motion to strike plaintiff's first amended complaint Filed

Motion to Strike - Motion Rescheduled

4/9/2020: Motion to Strike - Motion Rescheduled

Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint - Motion Rescheduled

4/9/2020: Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint - Motion Rescheduled

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

5/6/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion to Strike Granted

5/6/2020: Motion to Strike Granted

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

5/6/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

3/18/2020: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/17/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

3/15/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

2/26/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

2/26/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Demurrer to Complaint - Dropped

2/26/2020: Demurrer to Complaint - Dropped

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kathryn Horner Filed

2/7/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kathryn Horner Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 04/08/2020 09:30 AM D- 520

11/26/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 04/08/2020 09:30 AM D- 520

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11/26/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

11/25/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Complaint - Wrongful Termination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of non-opposition re; motion to strike plaintiff's first amended complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of non-opposition re; demurrer to plaintiff's first amended complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint; Judge: Julia Spain; Department: Dept 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to Strike; Judge: Julia Spain; Department: Dept 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer Sustained W/O Leave to Amend As To Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Filed by Alameda Health System, Kathryn Horner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketMotion to Strike Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 02/26/2020 02:00 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike Complaint Filed for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketMotion to Strike Complaint Reservation Set for dept: 520 date: 02/06/2020 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Reservation Set for dept: 520 date: 02/06/2020 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/08/2020 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Leticia Torres

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less