This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 19:20:28 (UTC).

Torgerson VS Payne

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 Torgerson filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Payne. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD SEABOLT and HON. Richard Seabolt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2722

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

RICHARD SEABOLT

HON. Richard Seabolt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TORGERSON, AMY

Amy Torgerson

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PAYNE , TRENT

CALIFORNIA STREET TOWNHOUSES

DARYL PAYNE AND TRENT PAYNE

PAYNE , DARYL

THE ESTATE OF JAMES PAYNE

ROSS, DOUGLASS

CHARLES STEPHENSON

CONNIE CHAN

Daryl Payne

Daryl Payne as administrator of the Estate of James Payne

Debbie Duthie

Doe 10 The Estate of ROBERT VALENCIA

Doe 5 VIRGINIA FREDERICK FAMILY TRUST

Cross Defendants

CHAN, CONNIE

SCHNEIDER, EUGENE

ROSS, DOUGLAS B.

THE ESTATE OF ROBERT VALENCIA

STEPHENSON, CHARLES

CHARLES STEPHENSON

CONNIE CHAN

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WOLFF, ANDREW

KRASHNA, OMAR

MCKEOWN, FRANCIS M

Andrew Wolff

Davis John Reilly

Francis M McKeown

Omar Krashna

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/19/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/5/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/5/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Returned Mail: Case Management Order Filed

9/3/2020: Returned Mail: Case Management Order Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/6/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/6/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

RETURNED MAIL Minute Order (Compliance Hearing RE: Mediation)

05/20/2022: RETURNED MAIL Minute Order (Compliance Hearing RE: Mediation)

Order re: Hearing on Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Cross Complaint

05/05/2022: Order re: Hearing on Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Cross Complaint

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to File a First ...)

05/05/2022: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to File a First ...)

Notice of Hearing

05/02/2022: Notice of Hearing

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

04/26/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Settlement

04/26/2022: Notice of Settlement

Order re: Compliance Hearing RE: Mediation

04/26/2022: Order re: Compliance Hearing RE: Mediation

Minute Order (Compliance Hearing RE: Mediation)

04/26/2022: Minute Order (Compliance Hearing RE: Mediation)

Answer

04/18/2022: Answer

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to File a First ...)

04/07/2022: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to File a First ...)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

04/07/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice 2. Defendants California Street Townhouses, Douglas Ross, Connie Chan And Charles Stephensons Notice Of Service By Electronic Means Pursuant To Coe Of Civil Procedure, Section 1010.6(E) And (F)

04/07/2022: Notice 2. Defendants California Street Townhouses, Douglas Ross, Connie Chan And Charles Stephensons Notice Of Service By Electronic Means Pursuant To Coe Of Civil Procedure, Section 1010.6(E) And (F)

127 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: RETURNED MAIL Minute Order (Compliance Hearing RE: Mediation) Filed by: Clerk As to: CONNIE CHAN (Defendant); CHARLES STEPHENSON (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Cross Complaint scheduled for 05/05/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 20 updated: Result Date to 05/05/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order re: Hearing on Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Cross Complaint Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to File a First ...); Category: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketMessage: Jury Trial scheduled for 07/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 20 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/02/2022; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketMessage: Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 06/27/2022 at 09:00 AM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 303 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/02/2022; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/22/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 20; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing RE: Mediation scheduled for 04/26/2022 at 02:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 20 updated: Result Date to 04/26/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order re: Compliance Hearing RE: Mediation Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Amy Torgerson Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Estate of James Payne Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Daryl Payne Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Trent Payne Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketMessage: Returned Mail: Notice of Case Management Conference Order Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 06/11/2020 02:30 PM D- 521; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Amy Torgerson; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCKEOWN, FRANCIS M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRASHNA, OMAR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REILLY, DAVIS J.