Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 21:16:26 (UTC).

Timothy Crofton Real Estates, Inc. VS Hanson Law Firm, PC

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 Timothy Crofton Real Estates, Inc filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against Hanson Law Firm, PC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA SPAIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9440

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA SPAIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TIMOTHY CROFTON REAL ESTATES, INC.

CROFTON, TIMOTHY

Defendants

HANSON LAW FIRM, PC

HANSON, CHRISTOPHER D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GRUEN, JAN A.

SLOME, BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

9/3/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

6/25/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion for Change of Venue (Out of County) Granted

6/25/2020: Motion for Change of Venue (Out of County) Granted

Response to Defts. Motion for Orde rAppointing Arbitrator/Transferring Venue Filed

6/15/2020: Response to Defts. Motion for Orde rAppointing Arbitrator/Transferring Venue Filed

Declaration in Support Response to Defts' Motion Filed

6/15/2020: Declaration in Support Response to Defts' Motion Filed

Reply Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion Filed

6/17/2020: Reply Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/27/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities Filed

2/26/2020: Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

3/4/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Granted

3/4/2020: Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Granted

Case Management Statement of Timothy Crofton Real Estates, Inc., Timothy Crofton Filed

1/21/2020: Case Management Statement of Timothy Crofton Real Estates, Inc., Timothy Crofton Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/22/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

1/23/2020: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 12/18/2019 09:30 AM D- 520

8/1/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 12/18/2019 09:30 AM D- 520

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8/1/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7/31/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Timothy Crofton Real Estates, Inc.

7/31/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Timothy Crofton Real Estates, Inc.

Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed

7/31/2019: Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Motion for Change of Venue (Out of County); Judge: Julia Spain; Department: Dept 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Change of Venue (Out of County) Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support Response to Defts' Motion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Defts. Motion for Orde rAppointing Arbitrator/Transferring Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketMotion for Change of Venue (Out of County) Hearing Confirmed for 06/25/2020 02:00 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Change of Venue (Out of County) Filed for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Timothy Crofton Real Estates, Inc., Timothy Crofton Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Filed for Timothy Crofton Real Estates, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/04/2020 02:00 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/18/2019 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Timothy Crofton Real Estates, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Professional Negligence Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HANSON LAW FIRM, PC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SLOME BRIAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRUEN, JAN A.