Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/19/2020 at 09:55:25 (UTC).

Tian VS Li

Case Summary

On 08/28/2018 Tian filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Li. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL M. MARKMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8573

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL M. MARKMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

TIAN, TIAN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

LI, LI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WANG, ELIZA X.

JEW, LEON E.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Filed

5/13/2019: Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Filed

Third Amended Cross-Complaint Filed

5/21/2019: Third Amended Cross-Complaint Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

5/7/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Tian Tian

4/2/2019: Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Tian Tian

Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time Filed for Tian Tian

2/15/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time Filed for Tian Tian

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

1/22/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

1/8/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

1/8/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

12/24/2018: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

12/31/2018: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint Filed for Plaintiff

11/20/2018: Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint Filed for Plaintiff

Answer to Complaint Filed for Li Li

10/15/2018: Answer to Complaint Filed for Li Li

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

10/15/2018: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tian Tian Filed

10/16/2018: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tian Tian Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Li Li Filed

9/11/2018: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Li Li Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 01/16/2019 09:00 AM D- 16

8/30/2018: Initial Case Management Conference 01/16/2019 09:00 AM D- 16

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

8/28/2018: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketCourt File Transfer to Hayward Hall of Justice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 07/13/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Court Trial 06/05/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 05/05/2020 09:00 AM D- 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Michael M. Markman; Department: Dept 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Court Trial 06/05/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 05/05/2020 09:00 AM D- 302

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Li Li

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail of Summons, Civil Case Cover Sheet, and Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Li Li Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Reservation Set for dept: 16 date: 10/16/2018 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/16/2019 09:00 AM D- 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Tian Tian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Fraud Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WANG, ELIZA XUAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jew, Leon E.