This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 11:00:46 (UTC).

The Regents of the University VS ISI Inspection Services, In

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 The Regents of the University filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against ISI Inspection Services, In. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS HAYASHI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6319

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DENNIS HAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

ISI INSPECTION SERVICES, INC.

MARTIN, JUAN

KING, EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BUALAT, NATHANIEL P.

PETERS, ELLIOT R.

RENICK, SYBIL

KAHN, MICHAEL A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

12/29/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

12/16/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

12/11/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

6/18/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

6/19/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

6/10/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party ISI Inspection Services, Inc., Edward Ki

6/10/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party ISI Inspection Services, Inc., Edward Ki

Letter from Keker Van Nest & Peters Filed

6/10/2020: Letter from Keker Van Nest & Peters Filed

Case Management Statement of Juan Martin Filed

8/30/2019: Case Management Statement of Juan Martin Filed

Case Management Statement of The Regents of the University of California Filed

8/29/2019: Case Management Statement of The Regents of the University of California Filed

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

8/14/2019: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

8/14/2019: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Motion to Compel (Motion) Denied

8/9/2019: Motion to Compel (Motion) Denied

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/13/2019 02:30 PM D- 518

8/9/2019: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/13/2019 02:30 PM D- 518

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

8/8/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

8/8/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

Motion to Compel Production of Documents - Motion Rescheduled

8/8/2019: Motion to Compel Production of Documents - Motion Rescheduled

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

8/8/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party ISI Inspection Services, Inc., Edward Ki

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: ISI Inspection Services, Inc., Edward King Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter from Keker Van Nest & Peters Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Edward King Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to ISI Inspection Services, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Juan Martin Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Edward King Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to ISI Inspection Services, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/11/2019 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for The Regents of the University of California

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Fraud Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ISI Inspection Services, Inc. Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RENICK, SYBIL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETERS, ELLIOT R.