This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 15:36:58 (UTC).

The People of the State of California VS Odiwe

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 The People of the State of California filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Odiwe. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRAD SELIGMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1699

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRAD SELIGMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITY OF OAKLAND

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ODIWE, AFAMEFUNA

ODIWE, ANWULIKA

PETE'S MOVING COMPANY

MANZANAREZ, RIGOMERO

ROES 1-10

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

PETE'S MOVING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PARKER, BARBARA J.

GARFINKEL, GREGG S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

5/15/2020: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Cross-Complaint Filed for Pete's Moving Company

8/28/2020: Cross-Complaint Filed for Pete's Moving Company

Declaration in Support pltf's Appln. for osc re: preliminary injunction Filed

7/8/2020: Declaration in Support pltf's Appln. for osc re: preliminary injunction Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/8/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/8/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/29/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/29/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/1/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/1/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Rejection Letter Issued on Entry of Default as to Party

2/18/2021: Rejection Letter Issued on Entry of Default as to Party

Declaration of Diligence Filed

2/24/2021: Declaration of Diligence Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Afamefuna Odiwe Filed

2/24/2021: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Afamefuna Odiwe Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Filed for The People of the State of California, City of

3/15/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Filed for The People of the State of California, City of

Stipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Granted

3/18/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Granted

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Anwulika Odiwe Entered

12/11/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Anwulika Odiwe Entered

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Anwulika Odiwe Filed

12/1/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Anwulika Odiwe Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Afamefuna Odiwe Filed

12/2/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Afamefuna Odiwe Filed

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Filed for The People of the State of California, City of

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Afamefuna Odiwe Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party Afamefuna Odiwe Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Diligence Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Entry of Default as to Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Anwulika Odiwe Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 04/13/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Temporary Restraining Order Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 09/01/2020 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 07/28/2020 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Temporary Restraining Order Filed for The People of the State of California, City of

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for The People of the State of California

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PETE'S MOVING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARFINKEL, GREGG S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER BARBARA JEAN