This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/15/2021 at 00:22:09 (UTC).

The People of the State of Ca VS Eight Hundred Eighty Eight

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 The People of the State of Ca filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against Eight Hundred Eighty Eight. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YOLANDA NORTHRIDGE and TARA DESAUTELS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9480

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

YOLANDA NORTHRIDGE

TARA DESAUTELS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Claimants

LI, ZHUZHUAN

IU, SIU

WONG, LEON

YAO, YUEMEI

YOUNG, ANNA

ZENG, WEI QUAN

LIU - YOUNG, SUI KING

MAN, LILI

ZENG, HUO TENG

ZENG, WEI BIN

SONG, YING

YOUNG, BOCK KOON

Respondent

EIGHT HUNDRED EIGHTY EIGHT THOUSAND NINE HUNDRED AND THIRTY FOUR DOLLARS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PETERSON, NATHAN

CLARK, JAMES J.

KITTA, JOHN N.

ROSS, DAMONJASON J.M.

 

Court Documents

Hearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 05/14/2021 09:00 AM D- 1

2/4/2021: Hearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 05/14/2021 09:00 AM D- 1

Hearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 02/05/2021 09:00 AM D- 1

9/24/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 02/05/2021 09:00 AM D- 1

Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed

3/30/2020: Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed

Hearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 09/25/2020 09:00 AM D- 1

6/25/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 09/25/2020 09:00 AM D- 1

Hearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 06/26/2020 09:00 AM D- 1

3/19/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 06/26/2020 09:00 AM D- 1

Civil Court Trial Commenced and Continued

12/20/2019: Civil Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

11/13/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Wei Bin Zeng

10/28/2019: Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Wei Bin Zeng

Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Huo Teng Zeng

10/28/2019: Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Huo Teng Zeng

Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Ying Song

10/29/2019: Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Ying Song

Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Lili Man

10/29/2019: Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Lili Man

Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Wei Quan Zeng

10/29/2019: Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Wei Quan Zeng

Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Bock Koon Young

10/31/2019: Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Bock Koon Young

Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Anna Young

10/31/2019: Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Anna Young

Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Sui King Liu - Young

10/31/2019: Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Sui King Liu - Young

Petition - Other Filed

10/1/2019: Petition - Other Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for The People of the State of California

10/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for The People of the State of California

Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Leon Wong

10/17/2019: Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Leon Wong

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 1; Action: Petition - Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 10/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 08/06/2021 09:00 AM D- 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 05/14/2021 09:00 AM D- 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 02/05/2021 09:00 AM D- 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 09/25/2020 09:00 AM D- 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 06/26/2020 09:00 AM D- 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Petition - Other; Judge: Tara Desautels; Department: Dept 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil Court Trial dept: 1 date: 04/03/2020 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Ying Song

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Huo Teng Zeng

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Wei Bin Zeng

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Claim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Court Trial 12/20/2019 09:00 AM D- 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Yuemei Yao

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Siu Iu

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim Opposing Forfeiture (H&S) Filed by Leon Wong

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for The People of the State of California

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Other Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clark, James Jason

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KITTA, JOHN N.