Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/06/2021 at 13:52:32 (UTC).

TD Bank USA, N.A. VS Tran

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 TD Bank USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tran. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA SPAIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5265

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA SPAIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

TRAN, TRANG THI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PATENAUDE, RAYMOND A.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

10/7/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

8/26/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/8/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of TD Bank USA, N.A. Filed

4/27/2020: Case Management Statement of TD Bank USA, N.A. Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/6/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed

1/15/2020: Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Re-Notice of In Lieu of Subpoena to Appear at Trial Filed

11/26/2019: Re-Notice of In Lieu of Subpoena to Appear at Trial Filed

Case Management Statement of TD Bank USA, N.A. Filed

10/25/2019: Case Management Statement of TD Bank USA, N.A. Filed

Notice of Trial Filed for TD Bank USA, N.A.

10/3/2019: Notice of Trial Filed for TD Bank USA, N.A.

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Trang Thi Tran Filed

9/20/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Trang Thi Tran Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/27/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Order Trial Setting Order for Collection Cases Expedited Court Trial Filed

8/27/2019: Order Trial Setting Order for Collection Cases Expedited Court Trial Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Trang Thi Tran

8/15/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Trang Thi Tran

Initial Case Management Conference 11/06/2019 09:30 AM D- 520

8/16/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 11/06/2019 09:30 AM D- 520

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8/16/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for TD Bank USA, N.A.

6/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for TD Bank USA, N.A.

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/24/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Declaration Filed

6/24/2019: Declaration Filed

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 10/19/2020 02:30 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of TD Bank USA, N.A. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 07/20/2020 02:30 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 04/21/2020 02:30 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/06/2019 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Trang Thi Tran Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Trang Thi Tran

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Trang Thi Tran

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for TD Bank USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Collections Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATENAUDE & FELIX A.P.C. - RAYMOND A. PATENAUDE